HI HB33 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB33
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires real estate brokers and salespersons to use an escrow depository in transacting a sale or lease of real estate and to file their names with the deed or lease with the Bureau of Conveyances or Land Court. Requires the escrow depositories to provide Form 1099s to the transferors, transferees, and real estate brokers or salespersons involved in the sale or lease and to inform transferees about the requirements of certain related tax laws.
Title
Relating To Real Estate Brokers And Salespersons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to IAC/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-19 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB33 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to IAC/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=33&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB33_.HTM |