HI HB328 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB328
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to EET/HOU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to EET/HOU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for the installation of certain energy-efficient technologies on any privately owned single-family residential dwelling or townhouse, with limited restrictions. Requires private entities to review, and if necessary, change rules to allow for the placement of those technologies. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Energy Efficiency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to EET/HOU, WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 114). |
2021-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 786), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 484) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-16 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-16-21 10:30AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-16-21 at 10:30 AM in room 423. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-09-21 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HSG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 7) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HSG. |
2021-02-02 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-02-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB328 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Referred to EET/HOU, WAM.