HI HB327 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the Department of Transportation to develop and implement a single occupant vehicle access fee to use a zipper lane. Requires that revenues generated from the single occupant vehicle access fee be deposited in the state highway fund. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Transportation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-21SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1318) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Shimabukuro.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 1:00PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to TRS, WAM.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 32).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 829), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, McDermott.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 4:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 532) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-13HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback