HI HB323 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1372).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Classifies certain former military vehicles as special interest vehicles. Enables owners of former military vehicles to apply for registration. Makes conforming amendments. (HB323 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Motor Vehicle Registration.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateVetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1372).
2019-07-09HouseVetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1372).
2019-06-24SenateNotice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-19 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202)
2019-06-24HouseNotice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1202)
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 56).
2019-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 56) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Nishihara, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2019-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 10:35AM in conference room 225.
2019-04-23HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-19 1:30PM in conference room 225.
2019-04-23SenateReceived notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 827).
2019-04-22HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-04-22HouseHouse Conferees Changed: Representative McDermott added as Conferee. Representative Okimoto discharged as Conferee.
2019-04-18SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 814).
2019-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Takumi Co-Chairs; Okimoto.
2019-04-12HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 898).
2019-04-12SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Nishihara Co-Chair; Shimabukuro, Fevella.
2019-04-03SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 535).
2019-04-02HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-01HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 550) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-01SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Ruderman). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-29Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-01-19.
2019-03-29SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-29SenateReported from TRS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1668) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on TRS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 1:00PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to TRS/PSM.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 31).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 874), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno, Onishi.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
2019-02-12HouseDeferred one day 02-13-19.
2019-02-12HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 295) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-02-08HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-02-06HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-08-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback