HI HB32 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the manufacture for sale, sale, offer for sale, display for sale, trade, or distribution of certain animal fur products in the State. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Animal Fur Products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
2021-02-19HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 585) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-02-17HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Takumi.
2021-02-17HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-20HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback