HI HB314 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that providers of health or human services that receive state funds file annual financial reports and that the reports be disclosed to the department of taxation. Exempts certain contracts with existing reporting requirements. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Mandatory Reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16HouseThe committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-10HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1).
2021-02-10HouseReported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 135) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-04HouseThe committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
2021-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback