HI HB31 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Act 022, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Act 022, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the voter information requirements for election nomination papers and the withdrawal of a nominating voter's signature by requiring only the month and date portions of a voter's date of birth. Repeals the social security number requirements. (HB31 HD1)
Title
Relating To Election Nomination Papers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Act 022, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123). |
2019-04-24 | House | Act 022, on 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123). |
2019-04-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 687). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1889) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 7). |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 474) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Yamane, Thielen. |
2019-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-01-19 2:01PM in conference room 325. |
2019-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-01-19. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-31-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB132 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to JDC.