HI HB307 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 828).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Broadens the definition of "renewable energy" as used in the public utilities commission law to include other self-replenishing non-fossil fuel, non-nuclear resources. Amends the renewable energy technologies income tax credit by, among other things, including commercial seawater air conditioning systems. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Renewable Energy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateReceived notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 828).
2019-04-23SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 825).
2019-04-22HouseHouse Conferee(s) discharged.
2019-04-22HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Takumi, Cullen Co-Chairs; McDermott.
2019-04-22HouseRe-referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 56
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Baker, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Fevella.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 716) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Harimoto, Inouye, Kim, Moriwaki, Nishihara, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, L. Thielen. Noes, 4 (Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Ihara, Ruderman). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) S. Chang). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-05SenateReported from EET/CPH/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1897) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-04-04SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Kidani, Taniguchi, Fevella.
2019-04-04SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen, Fevella ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Ruderman; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
2019-04-04SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella.
2019-04-02SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-04-19 10:40AM in conference room 211.
2019-04-02SenateThe committee(s) on EET deferred the measure until 04-04-19 1:35PM in conference room 414.
2019-04-02SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 04-04-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on EET/CPH/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-19 9:50AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-29SenateRe-Referred to EET/CPH/WAM.
2019-03-27SenateThe committee on CPH deferred the measure.
2019-03-27SenateThe committee on EET deferred the measure.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on EET/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-19 2:45PM in conference room 414.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to EET/CPH.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 365).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, Perruso, Thielen, Wildberger voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HousePassed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima excused (2).
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1153), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-28HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Wildberger; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-02-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-28-19 2:05PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-28HouseRe-referred to FIN, referral sheet 26
2019-01-22HouseReferred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback