HI HB306 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB306
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "preceptor" and "volunteer-based supervised clinical training rotation" to improve accessibility for providers to receive income tax credits for acting as preceptors. Includes the director of health on the preceptor credit assurance committee. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH, WAM/CPN. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to CPN/HTH, WAM. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 11). |
2021-02-24 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-02-24 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 650), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 363), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas. |
2021-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-12-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1). |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 130) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB976 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB306 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Re-Referred to HTH, WAM/CPN.
HB306 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Re-Referred to HTH, WAM/CPN.