HI HB302 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB302
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to LBT, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to LBT, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the state YouthBuild program to assist nonprofit and public entities in applying and qualifying for federal YouthBuild program grants. Authorizes the department of labor and industrial relations to award grants to eligible nonprofit or public entities to meet the matching funds requirement for federal YouthBuild grant awards. Appropriates funds. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Workforce Development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to LBT, WAM. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 150). |
2023-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1022), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-27 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2023-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-27-23 1:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela excused (1). |
2023-02-13 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 311) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-07 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 02-07-23 9:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB302 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to LBT, WAM.