HI HB302 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB302
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Auditor to conduct a study, including a cost analysis, on the necessity and feasibility of establishing an agency within the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs to regulate homeowners associations, and to submit a report of its progress to the Legislature prior to the 2020 Regular Session.
Title
Relating To Homeowners Associations.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB302 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=302&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB302_.HTM |