HI HB30 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the throwing of burning material from a motor vehicle and imposes penalties.
Title
Highway Safety; Burning Material
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 265), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-09-11 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB971 (Same As) 2011-01-24 - (S) Referred to TIA, JDL.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=30 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HB30_.HTM |