HI HB2991 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates higher income tax brackets and rates for high-income individual taxpayers. Eliminates certain corporate tax exemptions. Provides for taxation of capital gains as ordinary income. Creates commission to provide a more equitable and progressive tax system. Also provides a means to fund public education and other high priority programs.
Title
Income Tax; Corporate Tax Exemptions; Capital Gains Tax; Tax Reform Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-02-23 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-23-10 5:00PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-23-10. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-22-10 4:30PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-02-17 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-17-10 3:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-04 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 18. | |
2010-01-28 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 9 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2991&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB2991_.HTM |