HI HB297 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Act 106, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1208).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Act 106, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1208).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs DOA to review the Aedes aegypti mosquito with Wolbachia bacteria, including Aedes aegypti mosquitoes originating from Hawaii stock that could be imported for landscape scale mosquito control, and render a determination to place it on the appropriate animal import list. Requires DOA, DOH, and DLNR to collaborate on a report to the Legislature with recommendations for appropriate vector control programs. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Mosquito Vector Control.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | Senate | Act 106, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1208). |
2019-06-25 | House | Act 106, on 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1208). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 882). |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-30 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 880). |
2019-04-26 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19. |
2019-04-24 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Creagan, B. Kobayashi, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2019-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Baker, Kanuha Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Creagan, B. Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Tarnas, Ward. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 715) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1979) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-19 10:15AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported from AEN/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1298) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to AEN/CPH, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 25). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 812), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4). |
2019-02-12 | House | Deferred one day 02-13-19. |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from HLT/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 273) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Holt, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-01-31 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by HLT/AGR on Wednesday, 02-06-19 8:40AM in conference room 312. |
2019-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/AGR on Thursday, 01-31-19 11:15AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |