HI HB287 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Act 140, 06/25/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1240).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Act 140, 06/25/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1240).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Broadens the individual's significant privacy interest under the UIPA to include records that if disclosed would create a substantial and demonstrable risk of physical harm to an individual. (HB287 CD1)
Title
Judiciary Package; UIPA; Government Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-29 | Senate | Act 140, 06/25/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1240). |
2015-06-29 | House | Act 140, on 06/25/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1240). |
2015-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 656). |
2015-05-01 | House | Recieved notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 695). |
2015-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-15. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 2). |
2015-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 05-01-15. |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 2) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Takayama, McDermott. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 525) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1423) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 04-06-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 170). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Say, Souki excused (2). |
2015-03-05 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 610) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-03 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kawakami, Takayama, Thielen; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, McDermott. |
2015-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-03-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB427 (Same As) 2015-01-26 - Referred to JDL.