HI HB2796 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - (S) Referred to JGO.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - (S) Referred to JGO.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a temporary restraining order to remain in effect for 90 days or until the personal service of a protective order is issued by the court, whichever occurs first. Provides for protective orders issued orally in court to be effective upon service of the respondent if the respondent is not present at the hearing for the protective order. Effective December 21, 2058. (HB2796 HD1)
Title
Domestic Abuse Orders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to JGO. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 151). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 549-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-23 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Luke, McKelvey, Mizuno, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Wakai, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Herkes, Morita. | |
2010-02-16 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-23-10 at 2:00PM. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-16-10 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-02-03 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-02-03 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 74-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2010-02-01 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Brower, Belatti, Carroll, Nishimoto, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Bertram, Shimabukuro. | |
2010-01-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 02-01-10 8:30 AM in House conference room 329. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 8 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |