HI HB2781 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-27 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-27 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a surcharge on general excise and use taxes. Effective 1/1/2031.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-24 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2781&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2781_.HTM |