HI HB2753 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the state YouthBuild Program to assist non-profit and public entities in applying and qualifying for federal YouthBuild Program grants. Authorizes DLIR to award grants to eligible non-profit or public entities to meet the matching funds requirement for federal YouthBuild grant awards. Appropriates funds. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Workforce Development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-18SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2020-05-18SenateReported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3551) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2020-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella.
2020-03-06SenateThe committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to LCA, WAM.
2020-02-28SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-02-28SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 120).
2020-02-27HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-27HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 763-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-24HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2020-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-24-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-12HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
2020-02-12HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 357-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-02-04HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-04-20 9:10AM in House conference room 309.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback