HI HB2753 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 2:00pm in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 2:00pm in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Part I: Establishes and appropriates funds for the Ohana Zone Pilot Program. Part II: Establishes and appropriate funds for the Emergency Department Homelessness Assessment Pilot Program. Part III: Authorizes DHS to establish the Return-to-Home Pilot Program and appropriates funds for the program. Part IV: Establishes and appropriates funds for a pre-arrest diversion pilot project. Part V: Appropriates funds to the Department of Human Services for the coordinated statewide homeless initiative. Part VI: Establishes and appropriates funds for a pilot project to operate a facility to provide shelter and mental health treatment for homeless individuals with severe mental illness who are subject to an assisted community treatment order or court ordered guardianship. Takes effect upon approval of the Department of the Attorney General. Part VII: Appropriates funds for various housing projects for vulnerable homeless individuals. Exempts the Department of Human Services from rulemaking pursuant to chapter 91, HRS, in the planning and construction of housing for vulnerable homeless populations. Requires services providers to enter data into the homeless management information system. Effective 7/1/3000. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 2:00pm in Conference Room 325. |
2018-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-18 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 670). |
2018-04-24 | House | House Conferees Added: Representative Keohokalole added as Conferee. |
2018-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-18 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Espero, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs; S. Chang. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Added: Representative Yamashita added as Conferee. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Belatti, Brower, Gates, Todd, Tupola. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 777) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3695) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from HMS/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3199) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Tokuda. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Green, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-18 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to HMS/HOU, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 256). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 920-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Nakamura, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Lowen, Todd, Tupola. |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-18 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 728-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-14 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 02-14-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Subjects
Appropriations ($)
Coordinated Statewide Homeless Initiative
Emergency Department Homelessness Assessment Pilot Program
Homelessness
Individuals with Severe Mental Illness
Ohana Zone Pilot Program
Pre-arrest Diversion Pilot Project
Report
Return-to-Home Pilot Program
Coordinated Statewide Homeless Initiative
Emergency Department Homelessness Assessment Pilot Program
Homelessness
Individuals with Severe Mental Illness
Ohana Zone Pilot Program
Pre-arrest Diversion Pilot Project
Report
Return-to-Home Pilot Program