HI HB2750 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the imposition of restrictions on a person's ability to obtain or renew a driver's license or to register, renew the registration of, or transfer or receive title to a motor vehicle, as a consequence of unpaid monetary obligations under certain circumstances. Allows certain individuals to petition the court for a driver's license or motor vehicle clearance. Applies to monetary assessments incurred on or after November 1, 2020. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Monetary Obligations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-10HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2020-07-10SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 425).
2020-07-10HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
2020-07-10HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2020-07-08SenateReceived notice of House intent to agree to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 421).
2020-07-06HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 611) in amended form (SD 2).
2020-07-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-07-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 07-06-20.
2020-07-02SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3763) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2020-06-30SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2020-06-26SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 06-30-20 9:46AM in conference room 016.
2020-06-26SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2020-06-26SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3696) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2020-06-24SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English.
2020-06-19SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 06-24-20 1:30PM in conference room 225.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to TRS, JDC.
2020-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 352).
2020-03-03HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Eli excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20.
2020-02-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 987-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-25HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Nakashima, Yamane.
2020-02-24HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:30PM in conference room 325.
2020-02-24HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-20 at 2:30pm.
2020-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-24-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2020-02-11HouseRe-referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 27
2020-02-07HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
2020-02-07HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 190-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2020-02-05HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Woodson.
2020-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-05-20 10:15AM in House conference room 423.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB2630 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 36

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback