HI HB2749 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the offices of the prosecuting attorney of the respective counties to collect and publish certain data relating to criminal defendants and prosecutorial decision-making. Requires governor to establish a prosecutorial transparency advisory board. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Prosecutorial Transparency.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 670-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-13 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Say, Yamane. |
2020-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-13-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Thursday, 02-13-20 at 2:00pm. |
2020-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-12-20 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2239 (Same As) 2020-01-28 - Re-Referred to PSM/JDC, WAM.
Subjects
Advisory Board
Criminal Justice Research Institute
Office of the Prosecuting Attorney
Prosecutorial Transparency
Reporting Requirements
Criminal Justice Research Institute
Office of the Prosecuting Attorney
Prosecutorial Transparency
Reporting Requirements