HI HB2747 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to article XVI, section 2, of the state constitution to authorize the legislature to enact laws to require the forfeiture or reduction of benefits of any member, former member, or retirant of the employees' retirement system who is convicted of a felony related to the member's, former member's, or retirant's employment with the State or any political subdivision thereof. Effective 7/1/2030. (HD3)
Title
Proposing An Amendment To Article Xvi, Section 2, Of The Hawaii State Constitution, To Authorize The Legislature To Require The Forfeiture Or Reduction Of Pension Benefits Of A Member, Former Member, Or Retirant Of The Employees' Retirement System Who Is Convicted Of A Felony Related To The Member's, Former Member's, Or Retirant's Employment With The State Or Any Political Subdivision Thereof.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-05 | House | Notice of a bill proposing constitutional amendment in the form of (HD 3) transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 351). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Eli excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 976-20) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Nakamura, Nishimoto. |
2020-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-19-20 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 588-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-20 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Wednesday, 02-12-20 at 2:15 PM. |
2020-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-11-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Saiki, Yamashita excused (3). |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 151-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-02-04 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-04-20 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |