HI HB2745 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the rental assistance program by increasing the minimum percentage of affordable units a rental housing project is required to maintain for eligible tenants from 20 percent to 30 percent. Decreases the qualifying maximum ceiling from 80 percent to 30 percent of the area median income for a family or individual to be an eligible tenant under the rental assistance program. Appropriates moneys to support new rental assistance program contracts. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Rental Assistance Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Brower, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Gates, Hashem, Todd, McDermott. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 773) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3676) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3004) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 255). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 926-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Nakamura, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Lowen, Todd, Tupola. |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-18 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6). |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 481-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-06-18 9:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |