HI HB2741 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to TRN/EEP, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to TRN/EEP, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a transition to silent, clean electric mopeds by prohibiting a retailer from selling or offering for sale combustion engine-powered mopeds beginning January 1, 2022.
Title
Relating To Mopeds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN/EEP, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3055 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to TRN/EEP, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2741&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2741_.HTM |