HI HB2739 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Transfers lands to DLNR and establishes that land and adjacent, state-owned land as the Ka Iwi coast state park. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Ka Iwi Coast.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-26SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2020-06-26SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3687) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishihara.
2020-03-09SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-20 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to WTL, WAM.
2020-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 349).
2020-03-03HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Eli excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20.
2020-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 975-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-24HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2020-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-24-20 12:00PM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-12HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
2020-02-12HouseReported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 329-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-02-07HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-02-04HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 02-07-20 9:30AM in House conference room 325.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback