HI HB2737 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the fireworks display permit fee from $110 to $150 and the fine for certain fireworks violations from $2,000 per violation to $5,000 per violation. Clarifies that each aerial device, display firework, or article pyrotechnic having a total weight of 25 pounds or less that is illegally imported, transferred, or sold constitutes a separate violation. Increases the penalty for removing or extracting the pyrotechnic contents. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Fireworks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 03-17-20 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2020-03-06SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 1:30PM in conference room 229.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
2020-02-28SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-02-28SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 118).
2020-02-27HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-27HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 751-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-19HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Eli.
2020-02-14HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-19-20 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-14HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
2020-02-14HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 592-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
2020-02-12HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-02-11HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-20 2:15PM in conference room 325.
2020-02-11HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Wednesday, 02-12-20 at 2:15 PM.
2020-02-07HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-11-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2020-02-04HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2020-02-04HouseReported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 48-20), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2020-01-31HouseThe committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2020-01-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Friday, 01-31-20 10:00AM in House conference room 430.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback