HI HB2727 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes certain disclosure requirements for publishers of video games that contain a system of purchasing a randomized reward. Appropriates funds. (HB2727 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Consumer Protection.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2018-03-08SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-03-08SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 377).
2018-03-06HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Ito, McKelvey, Ohno, Onishi, Say, Tokioka, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-03-02HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1134-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-03-01HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole.
2018-03-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-01-18 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
2018-02-16HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har, McKelvey, Say, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
2018-02-16HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 755-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2018-02-14HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Ito, Say, Tokioka; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Yamane.
2018-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-14-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2018-01-29HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9
2018-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB3025 (Same As) 2018-04-16 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 786).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback