HI HB2724 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Re-Referred to TRE/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Re-Referred to TRE/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Office of Clean Energy to assume the duties of the energy resources coordinator, presently the director of the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism. Transfers the functions of the State Energy Office to the Office of Clean Energy. Appropriates moneys. (HB2724 HD1)
Title
Relating To State Energy Agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE/GVO, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to TRE/ETT/GVO, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 376). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1110-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-28-18 12:15PM in conference room 308. |
2018-02-23 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 617-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-13-18 9:45AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from EEP/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 207-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane, McDermott. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/EDB on Wednesday, 02-07-18 10:35AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to EEP/EDB, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |