HI HB2722 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes each county to adopt ordinances to enforce section 291-71, Hawaii Revised Statutes, including through the establishment of penalties for failure to comply with its requirements or make reasonable efforts to maintain electric vehicle charging stations in working order. Clarifies that certain enforcement officers may enter private property to enforce electric vehicle parking space violations. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Electric Vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3416) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-09-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC/WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 275). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 903-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 619-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-07 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Creagan, Nakashima, Say. |
2020-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-07-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-20 at 2:00PM. |
2020-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-05-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |