HI HB2718 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes and appropriates funds for a climate change and human health adaptation coordinator within the department of health and related operating expenses. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Climate Change Mitigation And Adaptation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2020-05-13SenateReported from CPH/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3474) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai.
2020-03-06SenateThe committee(s) on CPH/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-20 9:15AM in conference room 229.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to CPH/AEN, WAM.
2020-02-28SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-02-28SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 116).
2020-02-27HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-27HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 734-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-24HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2020-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-24-20 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
2020-02-13HouseReported from EEP/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 464-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-02-11HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
2020-02-11HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
2020-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP/HLT on Tuesday, 02-11-20 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2020-01-30HouseRe-referred to EEP/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 9
2020-01-27HouseReferred to EEP/HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB2430 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to EEP/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 36

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback