HI HB2716 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the ocean sciences research tax credit. Effective for tax years beginning after January 1, 2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 1:31PM in conference room 229.
2020-03-09SenateRe-Referred to WTL, WAM.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to WAM.
2020-03-03SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 274).
2020-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 877-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-24HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2020-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-24-20 12:00PM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
2020-02-14HouseReported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 487-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-02-12HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-02-07HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 02-12-20 10:30AM in House conference room 325.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback