HI HB2712 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies the duties and responsibilities of a pharmacy benefit manager. Establishes quarterly reporting requirements to the Insurance Commissioner by pharmacy benefit managers. Authorizes audits of pharmacy benefit managers by the Insurance Commissioner. Expands the definition of pharmacy benefit manager. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Pharmacy Benefit Managers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-06 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-07HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
2020-02-07HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 249-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2020-02-06HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-06-20 8:45AM in House conference room 329.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB3095 (Same As) 2020-02-19 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback