HI HB2710 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - The committee(s) on PVM/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits a law enforcement officer to search a person convicted of violating certain temporary restraining orders or protective orders, including the person's motor vehicle and the person's residence, for firearms without obtaining a search warrant if the law enforcement officer has reason to believe acts of abuse, malicious property damage, or harassment by the person are imminent. Specifies that a seized firearm shall not be used for a subsequent conviction if the original search lacked probable cause but authorizes law enforcement to maintain the firearm until the registered owner can prove the firearm will be safely stored.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Protective Orders.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06HouseThe committee(s) on PVM/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2020-02-04HouseBill scheduled to be heard by PVM/JUD on Thursday, 02-06-20 2:15PM in House conference room 325.
2020-01-31HouseRe-referred to PVM/JUD, referral sheet 13
2020-01-27HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback