HI HB2704 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires DLNR and the judiciary to make improvements to state facilities to reach goals of net-zero energy and one hundred percent water reclamation by 1/1/2035 and 1/1/2045, respectively. Effective July 1, 2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To State Facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
2020-02-14HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 647-20), recommending referral to FIN.
2020-02-13HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima.
2020-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-13-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2020-02-07HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
2020-02-07HouseReported from WLH/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 225-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2020-02-05HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
2020-02-05HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WLH/EEP on Wednesday, 02-05-20 11:00AM in House conference room 325.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to WLH/EEP, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback