HI HB2703 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a pilot program to prevent targeted school violence. Appropriates funds to the office of homeland security to prevent targeted school violence. Takes effect on 7/1/2055. Repeals on 6/30/2024. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Preventing School Violence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
2020-06-22SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3643) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC.
2020-03-09SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2020-03-06SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-09-20 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to EDU, WAM/JDC.
2020-02-28SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-02-28SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 111).
2020-02-27HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-27HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 766-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott.
2020-02-19HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-14HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
2020-02-14HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 534-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2020-02-11HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima.
2020-02-10HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-11-20 2:01PM in conference room 325.
2020-02-10HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-20 2:01pm.
2020-02-07HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-10-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2020-02-07HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
2020-02-07HouseReported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 179-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2020-02-04HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Quinlan, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno.
2020-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 02-04-20 2:30PM in House conference room 309.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback