HI HB2700 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - The committee(s) on EEP/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Beginning January 1, 2022, requires all residential dwellings that are serviced by gas utilities to be constructed with gas detection systems installed. Requires sellers of residential real property to provide notice of the potential hazards of gas appliances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Gas.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-04HouseThe committee(s) on EEP/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2020-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP/HSG on Tuesday, 02-04-20 9:45AM in House conference room 325.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to EEP/HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback