HI HB2693 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits places of public accommodation from denying shelter to any person when an emergency alert advises the public to immediately seek shelter. Provides for a civil penalty for each violation. Provides immunity from civil liability, with certain exceptions. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Public Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2964) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 120). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 831-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 746-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-15 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2018-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-15-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2). |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from PBS/VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 186-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-02-01 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Fukumoto, Cachola, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Choy; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2018-02-01 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Creagan, DeCoite, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS/VMI on Thursday, 02-01-18 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to PBS/VMI, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |