HI HB2689 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - (S) The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - (S) The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts conveyances of agricultural water systems to Board of Agriculture from subdivision requirements; requires notice of conveyance to applicable county. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB2689 HD1)
Title
Agricultural Water Systems; Conveyance to State; Subdivision
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | (S) The committee on WTL deferred the measure. | |
2010-03-17 | (S) The committee on TIA deferred the measure. | |
2010-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 03-17-10 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA deferred the measure until 03-17-10 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA deferred the measure until 03-15-10 1:20PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 03-15-10 3:15PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-03-08 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-10 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to WTL/TIA. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 215). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 632-10), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-23 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Finnegan; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-23-10 1:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and M. Lee, Souki excused (2). | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Reported from WLO/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 254-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-05 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Wooley, Choy, Evans, Manahan, McKelvey, Takai, Tokioka, Wakai; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Berg, Marumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-02-05 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Har, Chang, Coffman, Herkes, C. Lee, Luke, Morita, Sagum; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Ching, Thielen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Chong. | |
2010-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO/AGR on Friday, 02-05-10 11:00am in House conference room 325. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to WLO/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |