HI HB2681 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of revenue bonds pursuant to part III of chapter 39, HRS, and appropriates funds to the Hawaii Technology Development Corporation for the purpose of constructing one Oahu and one neighbor island electrolysis hydrogen production, storage, and dispensing facility to be managed by the Hawaii Center for Advanced Transportation Technologies. Takes effect on 7/1/2112. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Energy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3652) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-20 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 107). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Kong excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 712-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 606-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Ichiyama, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Johanson, Matsumoto. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-20 9:30AM in conference room 309. |
2020-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-20. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 01-31-20 9:30AM in conference room 309. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 01-31-20 8:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |