HI HB2680 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 250, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1359).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to provide financing to assist the Mary N. Lucas Estate with the Kaloko reservoir. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special Purpose Revenue Bonds; Dam and Reservoir Owners; Mary N. Lucas Estate ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-13HouseAct 250, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1359).
2016-07-13SenateAct 250, 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1359).
2016-05-05HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2016-05-05SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 684).
2016-05-03HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
2016-05-03HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2016-05-03SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 676).
2016-04-29HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-14-16.
2016-04-15SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609).
2016-04-14HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2016-04-12HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 639) in amended form (SD 1).
2016-04-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House.
2016-04-08SenateOne Day Notice 04-12-16.
2016-04-08SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3476) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2016-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto.
2016-03-24SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-16 9:15AM in conference room 211.
2016-03-23SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2016-03-23SenateReported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3002) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2016-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom.
2016-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-16 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2016-03-10SenateReferred to WLA, WAM.
2016-03-10SenatePassed First Reading.
2016-03-10SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 350).
2016-03-08HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2016-03-04HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16.
2016-03-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 858-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2016-03-01HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola.
2016-02-26HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-01-16 11:00AM in conference room 308.
2016-02-26HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2016-02-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-26-16 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
2016-02-18HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3).
2016-02-18HouseReported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 431-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2016-02-08HouseThe committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
2016-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 02-08-16 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
2016-02-01HouseReferred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 5
2016-01-27HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback