HI HB2672 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to support the Hawaii ant lab in mitigating the effects of little fire ants in the State. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Little Fire Ants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5). |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 444-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-12 | House | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2024-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Monday, 02-12-24 2:00PM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |