HI HB2670 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Quinlan excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes that every judgment for child support is enforceable until paid in full.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Child Support Enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-05 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Quinlan excused (2).
2020-02-11HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 291-20), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-02-05HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima.
2020-02-04HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-20 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2020-02-04HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-20.
2020-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-04-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB2665 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:05PM in conference room 325.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback