HI HB2661 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Act 001, 05/15/2020 (Gov. Msg. No. 1101).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds to provide for the expenses of the Legislature, Auditor, Legislative Reference Bureau, Ombudsman, and Ethics Commission. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making Appropriations To Provide For The Expenses Of The Legislature, The Auditor, The Legislative Reference Bureau, The Ombudsman, And The Ethics Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-18SenateAct 001, 05/15/2020 (Gov. Msg. No. 1101).
2020-05-18HouseAct 001, on 05/15/2020 (Gov. Msg. No. 1101).
2020-03-13HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2020-03-13HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 526).
2020-03-13SenatePassed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) Baker, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Nishihara). Transmitted to House.
2020-03-12SenateOne Day Notice 03-13-20.
2020-03-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading.
2020-03-12SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3403) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2020-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Fevella.
2020-03-06SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 11:05AM in conference room 211.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to WAM.
2020-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 346).
2020-03-03HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4).
2020-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 959-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2020-02-19HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Eli.
2020-02-14HouseProposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-19-20 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback