HI HB2657 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of public safety to plan for a model wellness center on State land. Report to legislature in 2011. Effective on approval. (SD1)
Title
Public Lands; Kulani Correctional Facility
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Kymberly Pine [R] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-18 | (S) Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2758) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, English, Gabbard, Galuteria, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-09 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-10 1:25PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to PSM, WAM. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 211). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 622-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-22-10 4:35PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-19 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-22-10. | |
2010-02-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-19-10 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused (3). | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 355-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-11 | (H) The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Aquino, Awana, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Rhoads, Souki, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Saiki, Takumi, Pine. | |
2010-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-11-10 11:35AM in conference room 309. | |
2010-02-04 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-02-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-04-10 8:30 AM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |