HI HB2656 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to HRE, WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to HRE, WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii justice league program to provide partial loan repayments on behalf of eligible lawyers that pursue public interest work in Hawaii. Provides for loan repayments by the University of Hawaii William S. Richardson School of Law. Establishes the Hawaii justice league revolving fund. Makes an appropriation. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Access To Justice.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM/JDC. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 106). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 764-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott. |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 541-20), recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-11 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Say, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Takayama. |
2020-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-11-20 2:01PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-20 2:01pm. |
2020-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-10-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 64-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-01-31 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Quinlan, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Friday, 01-31-20 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2479 (Same As) 2020-01-23 - Referred to HRE, WAM/JDC.