HI HB2656 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 278, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1381).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires all crematoriums operating without air pollution control permits and that were constructed prior to March 20, 1972, to submit permit applications to DOH by December 31, 2013. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Air Pollution Control; Permit; Crematoriums

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-10 (S) Act 278, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1381).
2012-07-10 (H) Act 278, on 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1381).
2012-04-24 (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 666).
2012-04-23 (H) Transmitted to Governor.
2012-04-23 (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Awana, Ching, Giugni, Har, Morikawa, Takai voting no (6) and Representative(s) Marumoto, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (3).
2012-04-23 (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2012-04-20 (H) Deferred one day 04-23-12.
2012-04-20 (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 633).
2012-04-19 (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-12
2012-04-16 (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 754).
2012-04-16 (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Gabbard, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Slom.
2012-04-13 (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 547).
2012-04-12 (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2012-04-10 (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 650) in amended form (SD 2).
2012-04-10 (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2012-04-05 (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-12.
2012-04-05 (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3243) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2012-03-29 (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi.
2012-03-27 (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-12 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2012-03-23 (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2012-03-23 (S) Reported from HTH/ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2969) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2012-03-21 (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom.
2012-03-21 (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2012-03-16 (S) The committee(s) on HTH/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-12 3:30PM in conference room 229.
2012-03-08 (S) Referred to HTH/ENE, WAM.
2012-03-08 (S) Passed First Reading.
2012-03-08 (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 279).
2012-03-06 (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Takumi excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2012-03-02 (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12.
2012-03-02 (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 889-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2012-02-28 (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
2012-02-24 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-27-12 4:00PM in House conference room 308.
2012-02-15 (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, C. Lee, M. Lee, Tokioka excused (4).
2012-02-15 (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 407-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2012-02-09 (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, Cabanilla, Chang, Ito, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes.
2012-02-06 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-09-12 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2012-01-25 (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 8
2012-01-25 (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading.
2012-01-24 (H) Pending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback