HI HB2653 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Replaces the environmental response, energy, and food security tax with a carbon emissions tax. Repeals state fuel taxes under the fuel tax law. Takes effect 1/1/2021; provided that repeal of the fuel tax credit for commercial fishers takes effect beginning with taxable years after 12/31/2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseThe committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2020-02-07HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-13-20 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB3149 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to AEN/EET, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback