HI HB2651 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the right to enter private property and remove or stabilize natural hazards that are at risk of harming the public or other properties to the county in which the private property is located and that county's respective mayor.
Title
Relating To Hazard Mitigation.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Mahina Poepoe [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3014 (Same As) 2024-02-12 - Re-Referred to GVO, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2651&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2651_.HTM |