HI HB2648 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the period that a county may adopt a surcharge on state tax, under certain conditions, from March 31, 2019, to December 31, 2020. Allows a county with a population equal to or less than five hundred thousand that adopts a surcharge on state tax to use surcharge revenues for disaster relief.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-27HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB2686 (Same As) 2020-02-19 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback