HI HB2643 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of agriculture to conduct preclearance quarantine inspections prior to direct travel to or from the State. Appropriates funds to implement a preclearance quarantine inspection.
Title
Relating To Agricultural Inspections.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-05-20 8:35AM in House conference room 312. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2976 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2643&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2643_.HTM |